THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 6:34:23 AM
Deernsted, Eric August
CPSO#:
26631
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
02 Aug 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Sep 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1974 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 02 Aug 2002 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 01 Feb 1980
Summary:
In February 1980, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Deernsted guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 577/75, as amended, in that he falsified a record in respect of the examination or treatment of a patient, contrary to s. 26(15); and in that he committed sexual impropriety with a patient, contrary to s. 26(28). Consequently the Committee ruled that Dr. Deernsted be reprimanded and that his licence be suspended for a period of thirty days.
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Hearing Date(s): 30 Jan 1980