THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 6:42:30 AM
Hackett, Robert Andrew
CPSO#:
26590
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1975 |
CFPC Specialist |
Psychiatry |
Effective:08 Jun 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Sep 1991 to 31 Aug 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Sep 1992 to 31 Aug 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Sep 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Aug 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Sep 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1974 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2021 |