THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 23:05:18 PM
Wong, Arnold Kai Yuen
CPSO#:
26586
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jan 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, Univers, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Arnold K. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 20 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Management Ltd: Unit 13-1 High Meadow Place, Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 21 May 2021
Instructions/Address:Medical records location: Records Management Ltd.
Patients looking to obtain copies of the medical charts should
contact toll free: 1-800-775-0093, email to:
[email protected], or send written request by mail to: 1 High
Meadow Place Unit 13 Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 05 Feb 2021
Instructions/Address:: Patients seeking access to a copy of their medical record may contact: Records Management Ltd., 1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 21 Jan 2021
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking access to a copy of their medical record may contact: Records Management Ltd., 1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 21 Jan 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1974 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jan 2021 |