THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 7:40:30 AM
Flatman, John Garneys
CPSO#:
26577
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
13 May 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Dec 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
12-Jan-2007
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1957
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:26 Nov 1965 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1974 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 1999 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 1999 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 May 2003 |