THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 3:28:59 AM
Crosby, John Wyatt
CPSO#:
26542
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
04 Oct 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jun 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Crosby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 4 2023
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients who are looking to obtain a copy of their medical record with Dr. Crosby may contact Dr. Rafael Gevorkyan (CPSO# 94751) at:
46 Adam Street
Cambridge, ON
N3C 2K3
Phone: (519) 658-0040
Fax: (888) 651-9747
Date Received: 16 Jan 2024
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:07 Dec 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1974 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Oct 2023 |