THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 13:33:21 PM
Kristensen, John Williams
CPSO#:
26525
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
30 May 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Oct 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
USA - Texas
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Jun 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 1974 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 Feb 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Feb 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Aug 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 May 2023 |