THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 18:36:39 PM
Schwartz, Elliott Michael
CPSO#:
26523
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
19 Oct 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jun 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
19-Oct-2022
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. E. Michael Schwartz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 24 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1979 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Nov 1984 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1973 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jun 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 1974 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 19 Oct 2022 |