THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 5:23:11 AM
Gore, Stanley Larry
CPSO#:
26503
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
25 Apr 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
07 Mar 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1974 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Mar 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Mar 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 Apr 2022 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Jan 2005
Summary:
On January 19, 2005, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Gore to have committed acts of professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct or acts relevant to the practice of medicine that would reasonably be regarded by members as being disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional in that he signed or co-signed prescriptions for individuals who are not his patient and prescibed to both people and animals without ever having seen or assessed the patient. Additionally, he received fees for each prescription co-signed, without advising the consumers of the fee, and to have failed to keep charts or records for the patients.
The penalty hearing took place on March 10, 2005. On March 10, 2005, the Discipline Committee accepted the joint submission on penalty proposed by counsel for the College and counsel for Dr. Gore and ordered that Dr. Gore appear before the panel to be reprimanded and that he pay $5,000 in costs to the College.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 2005-03-10
Hearing Date(s): Oct 04, 2004