THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:22:03 AM
Usher, Ann Kathryn
CPSO#:
26490
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jun 1974
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jun 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Usher-Owen, Ann Kathryn (used until: 06 Nov 1997 )
Usher-Boyd, Ann Kathryn (used until: 09 May 1994 )
Boyd, Ann Kathryn Usher (used until: 20 Mar 1988 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus
B2424- 800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8338
Fax: (519) 685-8080
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:17 Nov 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANN KATHRYN USHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. USHER is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1974 |