THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 7:46:38 AM
Scully, Hugh Edwards
CPSO#:
26458
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 May 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 1965
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Dr. Hugh E. Scully
318 - 2095 Lakeshore Blvd W
Toronto ON M8V 4G4
Date Received: 01 Jun 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:18 Nov 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:19 Nov 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1965 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 May 1974 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |