THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 20:51:46 PM
Rafail, Ehab Assaad
CPSO#:
26402
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
23 Feb 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Apr 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Rafail Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 4 2004
Corporation Name: Rafail Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 19 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:08 Nov 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Apr 1974 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 23 Feb 2015 |