THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 1:14:26 AM
Hunter, Alasdair Grant Walker
CPSO#:
26368
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
26 Apr 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:For medical records patient should contact the Genetic Clinic where patient was seen.
Date Received: 08 Jun 2017
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Newfoundland and Labrador
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:10 Nov 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Genetics and Genomics |
Effective:29 Jun 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Mar 1974 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 07 Dec 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Apr 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2017 |