THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 3:17:33 AM
Lee, Dig Sung
CPSO#:
26351
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
16 Aug 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Oct 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: National Taiwan University, 1965
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:15 Nov 1972 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Feb 1974 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 30 Nov 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 23 Feb 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 17 Mar 2017 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 16 Aug 2018 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: March 17, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Dig Sung Lee to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 17, 2017:
Dr. Lee was the subject of complaints which led to College investigations into whether he engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his family practice. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Lee has ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.