THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 8:31:55 AM
Stevenson, Robert Francis
CPSO#:
26338
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Feb 1974
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Feb 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4-100 Waterloo Rd
Timmins ON P4N 4X5
Phone: 705-267-7327
Electoral District: 08
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:07 Nov 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT FRANCIS STEVENSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEVENSON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1970 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 1971 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Feb 1974 |