THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 10:15:10 AM
Hradecky, Cyril Michael
CPSO#:
26329
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Apr 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Patients seeking a copy of their records may contact: Queensway Carleton Hospital, 3045 Baseline Road, Ottawa, ON, K2H 8N7 or Tel: 613-721-4700.
Date Received: 26 Apr 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:03 Nov 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Feb 1974 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Apr 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 30 Apr 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2019 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: April 30, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Cyril Michael Hradecky to the College of Physicians and Surgeons effective April 30, 2017:
Dr. Hradecky may only practise as a surgical assistant under the direction of a qualified surgeon. Further, Dr. Hradecky shall limit his practice to Queensway Carleton Hospital (Ottawa) unless he obtains the consent of the College to practise elsewhere.