THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 19:00:48 PM
Alexis, Mercy Eunice
CPSO#:
26238
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
28 Apr 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Nov 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
7-Jun-2022
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Akan, English
Education: University of Amsterdam, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Kingsway Dermatology
1243 Islington Ave
Unit 1000
Etobicoke, ON M8X 1Y9
Date Received: 28 Apr 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:25 Nov 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Nov 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 28 Apr 2022 |