THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 14:56:05 PM
Cameron, Hugh Urquhart
CPSO#:
26228
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Oct 1973
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Sep 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of St. Andrews, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
43 Wellesley Street East
Suite 318
Toronto ON M4Y 1H1
Phone: (416) 967-8734
Fax: (416) 975-2679
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Hugh U. Cameron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 4 2014
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:04 Nov 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HUGH URQUHART CAMERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMERON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 1973 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 2022 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 2022 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2022 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: November 17, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)