THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 14:39:46 PM
Palmgren, Elisabeth
CPSO#:
26206
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Oct 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Swedish
Education: Royal Caroline Medico-Surgical Institute, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:22 Mar 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 1971 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1972 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Apr 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2013 |