THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 2:30:21 AM
Turpie, Irene Drummond
CPSO#:
26199
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Aug 1981
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Aug 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
30 Melville St
Dundas
Dundas ON L9H 1Z8
Phone: (905) 317-2093
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Uganda
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:07 Dec 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IRENE DRUMMOND TURPIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURPIE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jun 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Oct 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1977 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Aug 1981 |