THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 4:19:56 AM
Inouye, Tetsuo
CPSO#:
26156
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
10 Dec 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Jan 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: T. Inouye Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 13 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Contact above
Records Management Ltd
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
1 800 775 0093
Fax: 647-933-2904
www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 03 Dec 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 Nov 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:23 Nov 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Dec 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Dec 2014 |