THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 23:33:49 PM
Jirsch, Jacqueline Edith
CPSO#:
26111
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
24 Nov 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 Mar 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:09 Nov 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 23 Aug 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Mar 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 Nov 2010 |