THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 7:16:46 AM
Jacob, Moire Susan
CPSO#:
26097
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Mar 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Mar 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Tamil, Urdu
Education: University of Madras, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Oct 1972 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Specified Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 Aug 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Mar 2000 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2013 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: March 31, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Moire Susan Jacob, to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”).
(1) I, Dr. Jacob, certificate of registration number 26097, am a member of the College. The College has received information regarding my standard of practice.
(2) I, Dr. Jacob, acknowledge that I am the subject of an investigation by the College regarding my care and conduct (the “Investigation”). There has been no referral to the Discipline Committee of the College in respect of the Investigation.
(3) I, Dr. Jacob, hereby resign from the College effective March 31, 2013 (the “Effective Date”).
(4) I, Dr. Jacob, hereby acknowledge that I am winding down my practice and undertake that between the date upon which I execute this Undertaking and the Effective Date, I shall see only existing patients. For greater clarity, I shall not accept any new referrals or assess or treat any patient whom I have not seen previously between the date upon which I execute this Undertaking and the Effective Date.
(5) I, Dr. Jacob, hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a certificate of registration to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the Effective Date.