THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 16:56:17 PM
Cunningham, Colin Duncan Baird
CPSO#:
26052
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
15 Oct 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Aug 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
15-Oct-2018
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Edinburgh, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:03 Nov 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 1973 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 04 Aug 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 2004 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 15 Oct 2018 |