THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 6:59:47 AM
Johnson, Joseph Radnor
CPSO#:
26022
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
09 Nov 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Aug 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
31-Jan-2015
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of West Indies, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:01 Jan 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 Nov 2009 |
Concerns
Source:
Executive Committee
Active Date: November 9, 2009
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Joseph Radnor Johnson to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):
I, Dr. Joseph Radnor Johnson:
1). Acknowledge that I was the subject of an investigation under section 75 of the Health Professions Procedural Code and an investigation in relation to a public complaint (the “Investigations”) by the College regarding whether I have engaged in acts of professional misconduct and whether I am incompetent in the practice of medicine.
3). Hereby resign from the College.
4). Hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
6). Agree that in the event that the College should became aware that I have either applied, re-applied for registration to practise medicine in any jurisdiction, the College shall, have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and, if successful, shall have the right to re-commence the Investigations it terminated as a result of this undertaking, and/or proceed with a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.
8). Consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public.