THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 20:50:57 PM
Garry, Thomas Vincent
CPSO#:
26006
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
13 Jan 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Aug 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Irish Conjoint Board, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 1973 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 01 May 2000 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 Jan 2005 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 05 Apr 2000
Summary:
On April 5, 2000, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Garry(s plea of guilty and found him guilty of professional misconduct in that he signed or issued, in his professional capacity, documents he knew or ought to have known were false or misleading and engaging in conduct that would be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. The Committee ordered the following penalty:
(1) Dr. Garry to appear before the panel to be reprimanded;
(2) The fact of the reprimand is to be recorded on the Register;
(3) The Registrar is directed to suspend Dr. Garry(s certificate of registration for a period of two months, the suspension to commence on a date to be fixed by the Registrar, within 60 days of this order becoming final;
(4) Dr. Garry is to pay to the College, $5,000.00 in costs, to be paid in the amount of $1,000.00 per month to be paid on the first day of May, June, July, August and September, 2000.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 05, 2000