THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 3:47:52 AM
Tran, Tinco
CPSO#:
26001
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
21 Jun 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
29 Aug 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Vietnamese
Education: University of Saigon, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 1973 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 13 Aug 1979 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Aug 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 Jun 1996 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Oct 1980
Summary:
In October 1980, Dr. Tran pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 60(3)(a) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1974, as amended, in that he had been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practice. The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and found Dr. Tran guilty of professional misconduct. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Tran's licence to practice be suspended for a period of one year, but that this penalty be itself suspended without terms or conditions. The Committee also ruled that Dr. Tran be reprimanded.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 24 Oct 1980