THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:55:46 AM
Andrews, John Ernest
CPSO#:
25989
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Aug 1973
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Aug 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: English Conjoint Board, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
60 Champlain Street
North Bay ON P1B 7M4
Phone: (705) 472-2898
Fax: (705) 472-9959
Electoral District: 08
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: John Andrews Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 16 2018
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North Bay Regional Health Centre |
North Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 Nov 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN ERNEST ANDREWS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDREWS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 1973 |