THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 7:26:29 AM
Macrae, Duncan Lloyd
CPSO#:
25958
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
27 Jul 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Duncan MacRae Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 17 2014
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Please contact Dr. John Yoo for medical records.
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London, ON N6A 5W9
Tel: 519 685 8500 ext. 55699
Fax: 519 685 8468
Date Received: 14 Aug 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:01 Jan 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |