THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 11:14:00 AM
Hew, Joseph Weng Onn
CPSO#:
25915
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
27 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
29 May 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical Sch, 1960
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Hew Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 1 2010
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 1973 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 25 Nov 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 May 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 Jul 2010 |