THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 10:45:18 AM
Sutherland, Richard Ian Lloyd
CPSO#:
25904
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Aug 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Supervised Short Duration Practice
as of
23 Mar 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:07 Nov 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:19 Nov 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Mar 2021 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Aug 2021 |