THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 22:22:27 PM
Mucha, Mary Ann Jane
CPSO#:
25873
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
12 Jul 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Mary Ann Mucha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Accuro Health Services
Unit 1B
700 Industrial Avenue
Ottawa, ON K1G 0Y9
Date Received: 28 May 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 Dec 1996 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |