THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 8:00:32 AM
Montgomery, Hugh John
CPSO#:
25867
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Feb 1978
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Feb 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1005 St. Lawrence Street
PO Box 430
Merrickville ON K0G 1N0
Phone: (613) 269-4707
Fax: (613) 269-3534
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Montgomery Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 4 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HUGH JOHN MONTGOMERY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONTGOMERY is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Feb 1976 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Feb 1978 |