THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:42:18 AM
Strauss, Hans Dietrich
CPSO#:
25847
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Dec 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 May 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: University of Toronto, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Hans Strauss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 13 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:12 Nov 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:24 Nov 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 28 Jun 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 May 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Dec 2021 |