THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 1:03:40 AM
Mehrmanesh, Zahra Flora
CPSO#:
25807
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Mar 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Persian
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Flora Mehrmanesh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 16 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:111 St Regis Crescent South, North York, ON M3J 1Y6. (416) 398-0638
Date Received: 09 May 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:14 Mar 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Apr 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |