THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 16:55:05 PM
Teitelbaum, Stanley
CPSO#:
25759
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
26 May 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Stanley Teitelbaum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 28 2023
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking access to a copy of their medical record can contact RSRS at: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 19 Oct 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Aug 1989 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 May 2023 |