THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:04:17 AM
Von Hanna, Silvia Gabriele
CPSO#:
25754
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
18 Aug 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Oct 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1973 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 27 May 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Aug 2014 |
Concerns
Source:
Discipline Committee
Active Date: August 18, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Von Hanna was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence. Dr. Von Hanna resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.