THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:57:04 AM
Brosky, Shirley Irene
CPSO#:
25733
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
26 Jun 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent S.
Toronto, Ontario
M3J 1Y6
Tel: (416) 398-0638
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: (416) 398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 15 Dec 2011
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1985 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2014 |