THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 22:20:48 PM
Gartenberg, David Samuel
CPSO#:
25716
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Feb 1994
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Manitoba, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1974 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jun 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Mar 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Feb 1994 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2014 |