THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:12:22 AM
Poon, Vincent Hung Kwan
CPSO#:
25709
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
22 Apr 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
908 - 3181 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M2K 2Y2
Phone: 416-221-0202
Electoral District: 10
Medical Records Location
Date Received: 29 Jun 2021
Date Received: 24 Aug 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Jan 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 22 Apr 2021 |