THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 23:16:13 PM
Tam, Thomas Chi-Hung
CPSO#:
25706
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Jun 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Tam, Tommy Chi-Hung (used until: 18 Jun 2002 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English, Mandarin
Education: University of Toronto, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Dr. M Ramprasad
204 - 2772 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON M4C 1L7
Tel: 416-691-2600
Date Received: 23 Sep 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1972 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Jun 1973 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |