THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 5:59:33 AM
Andrew, Philip John
CPSO#:
25700
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Feb 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Feb 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Millman, Philip John (used until: 08 Mar 1994 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
221B Mitton Street North
Sarnia ON N7T 6H5
Phone: (519) 339-1031
Fax: (519) 339-7591
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:07 Dec 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PHILIP JOHN ANDREW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDREW is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 28 Sep 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 May 1983 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Feb 2011 |