THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 15:56:05 PM
Hartwick, Karl Robert
CPSO#:
25661
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
09 Aug 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 May 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Karl Hartwick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 15 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Haliburton Family Medical Center
7217 Gelert Road
PO Box 870
Haliburton, Ontario
K0M 1S0
Date Received: 14 May 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1975 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Aug 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 May 2021 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2022 |