THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 21:01:48 PM
Wolff, Evelyn
CPSO#:
25660
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
08 Aug 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Jun 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Dutch, English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Aug 2012 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: December 4, 2012
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Evelyn Wolff to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”).
I, Dr. Evelyn Wolff:
1. Certificate of registration number 25660, was a member of the College between June 19, 1973 and August 8, 2012 (the “Resignation Date”). The College has received information regarding my standard of practice.
2. Acknowledge that I was the subject of an investigation (the “Investigation”) by the College regarding whether I have maintained the standard of practice of the profession (the “Investigation”).
3. Acknowledge that there has been no referral to the Discipline Committee of the College in respect of the Investigation and that the concerns arising in the Complaint were not proven before the Discipline Committee.
4. Acknowledge that I have voluntarily resigned my certificate of registration with the College.
5. Confirm that I am not registered as a physician and do not hold a license to practice medicine in any jurisdiction other than Ontario, nor do I have any outstanding applications for such registration or licensure.
6. Hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the date of this undertaking (the “Effective Date”).