THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 4:07:45 AM
Shier, John Dougall
CPSO#:
25620
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 Aug 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Accuro
700 Industrial Avenue
Ottawa, ON
K1G 0Y9
Tel: (613) 738-1242
Date Received: 11 Nov 2010
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1973 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |