THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 7:48:31 AM
McEnery, Peter Joseph
CPSO#:
25616
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
08 Aug 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Feb 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Peter McEnery Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 18 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1975 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1973 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Feb 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 19 Feb 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 16 Jun 2018 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Aug 2018 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: August 8, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Peter Joseph McEnery to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 8, 2018:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. McEnery engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his family practice. In the face of these allegations, Dr. McEnery resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)