THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 13:47:47 PM
Nabwangu, James Francis
CPSO#:
25595
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
26 Oct 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Jun 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Swahili
Education: The Johns Hopkins University, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:14 Mar 1972 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 1969 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1969 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 1973 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 26 Oct 1993 |