THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:54:46 AM
Rosman, Michael Alexander
CPSO#:
25577
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
08 Nov 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1965
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 1973 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 08 Nov 1995 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 06 Sep 1994
Summary:
In the course of a Discipline Hearing which began in June 1994, Dr. Rosman pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 61(3)(a) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1990, as amended, in that he had been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practice. The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and in a decision which was released in September 1994, found Dr. Rosman guilty of professional misconduct. Consequently, the Committee ordered on September 6, 1994, that Dr. Rosman's licence to practice be revoked.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 1995-11-08
Hearing Date(s): Jun 27, 1994