THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:34:17 AM
Wong, Peter Wai
CPSO#:
25530
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Apr 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: National Defense Medical Center, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:01 Jan 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Apr 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2000 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 25 Nov 1987
Summary:
In November 1987, Dr. Wong pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 60(3)(a) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, in that he had been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practice. The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. Wong guilty of professional misconduct. Consequently, the Committee imposed the following penalty:
1. Dr. Wong was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.
2. Dr. Wong(s licence to practice was to be suspended for a period of two years.
3. This penalty of suspension was itself to be suspended, subject to the following terms and conditions:
(a) Dr. Wong was to continue to receive treatment and guidance from his current psychiatrist, or from a psychiatrist of his choice acceptable to the Registrar.
(b) Dr. Wong was to waive the confidentiality of the doctor/patient relationship between himself and his treating psychiatrist, and to direct the psychiatrist to deliver a report on his progress to the Registrar quarterly.
(c) Dr. Wong was to direct his employer or his Chief to submit to the Registrar on a quarterly basis a report of satisfactory conduct.
(d) Dr. Wong was to have an attendant present at all specialty examinations of female patients.
Failure to comply with these conditions, or the receipt of an unsatisfactory report by the Registrar, would result in the immediate lifting of the suspension of penalty, and would result in the commencement of the full two-year period of suspension of Dr. Wong(s licence to practice.
Delivery of the reports, as required by sections 3(b) and 3(c) above, was to commence three months after the date upon which this Order became final.
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Hearing Date(s): 24 Nov 1987