THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 21:32:09 PM
Belovic, Branislav
CPSO#:
25480
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Mar 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Slovak
Education: University of Comenius, 1965
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. B. Belovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 12 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:MCI The Doctors Office
15 - 2575 Dundas Street West
Mississauga, ON L5K 2M6
Date Received: 01 Jun 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:26 Nov 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Mar 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |