THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 5:27:45 AM
Gfeller, Kenneth Fredrick
CPSO#:
25464
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
12 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Feb 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking for medical records should call 613-796-4073.
Date Received: 21 Jul 2023
Instructions/Address:Patients looking for medical records should call 613-729-0380 and listen to the recording which provides instructions as to how patients may obtain a copy of their medical records.
Date Received: 17 Mar 2009
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:06 Nov 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Jun 2023 |